skip to content

Smith, Peter Mortley

CPSO#: 19761

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.