skip to content

Smith, Nancy Isabel

CPSO#: 23230

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Jun-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard D. Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011