skip to content

Smith, Miles Alexander

CPSO#: 97971

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Taber Road
Rexdale Community Health Centre
Toronto ON  M9W 3A4
Phone: 416-744-0066
Fax: 416-744-1881 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILES ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 05 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015