Smith, Mara (CPSO#: 99113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36291
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARA SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 17 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 06 Feb 2019 to 04 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019