Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2003
Summary:
On December 1, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Gerald Dixon Smith committed acts of professional misconduct including sexual impropriety with a patient, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee directed that Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration be revoked immediately, effective January 20, 2004. On January 21, 2004, Dr. Smith appealed to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.
On March 13, 2006, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Smith(s appeal.
Therefore, Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario is revoked effective March 13, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-03-13
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 2002