skip to content

Smith, Frank Charles

CPSO#: 28172

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 May 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A
235 Pomona Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N1T2
Phone: (289) 337-1920
Fax: (289) 337-8323 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 42292
Fax: (905) 575-2591
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frank C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Smith ( CPSO# 28172 )

Business Address:
Suite A
235 Pomona Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 1T2
Phone Number: (289) 337-1920


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANK CHARLES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976