skip to content

Smith, David Richard

CPSO#: 92538

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Mar 2016