skip to content

Smith, David Richard

CPSO#: 92538

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

2888 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6B 4H6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Mar 2016