skip to content

Smith, Andrew Joseph

CPSO#: 85632

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 26 Sep 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
EL - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2008