skip to content

Smith, Andrew Lawrence

CPSO#: 97992

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 78033 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:26 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW LAWRENCE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 09 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2021