skip to content

Smith, Andrew James Kendric

CPSO#: 92373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Addiction Medicine Service
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 583-4685
Fax: (416) 595-6821 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Centre
20th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5997
Fax: (416) 586-5067
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pain Medicine Effective:07 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active
             Dr.  Andrew  James  Kendric  Smith  may practise medicine independently in pain
            medicine and addiction medicine, only.