skip to content

Smilovici, Brian

CPSO#: 97149

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 160 Stillview Avenue Pointe-Claire, QC H9R 2Y2
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015