skip to content

Smile, Sharon Carina

CPSO#: 86952

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehab Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 Jan 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020 Active
             Dr. Sharon Carina Smile may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.