skip to content

Smerdon, Kirsten

CPSO#: 99940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2868
Fax: (905) 721-6103 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kirsten Smerdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smerdon ( CPSO# 99940 )

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN SMERDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMERDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Feb 2013 to 08 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2016