skip to content

Small, Gary Robert

CPSO#: 94040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wales, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7279 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613 722 7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gary Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Small ( CPSO# 94040 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Gary Robert Small may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Small
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Small no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.