skip to content

Slobogean, Myron Gerard-Paul

CPSO#: 99073

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerard Slobogean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013