skip to content

Sloan, Ian Alexander Jeremy

CPSO#: 17736

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Nov 1960

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sloan, Ian Alexander (used until: 31 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Headache and Pain Relief Clinic Suite 220 251 Consumers Road Toronto ON M2J 4R3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:15 Dec 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016