skip to content

Sliwowicz, David

CPSO#: 23651

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
303-95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-6422
Fax: 9056836548 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Sliwowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sliwowicz ( CPSO# 23651 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (416) 386-6422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SLIWOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLIWOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1972