skip to content

Slezic, Ivo

CPSO#: 25389

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: I Slezic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Centre 6660 Kennedy, Mississauga ON L5T 2M9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 6, 2013, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Slezic privileges were restricted, efffective April 1, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017