skip to content

Slesers, Aris

CPSO#: 21453

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: April 30, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 30, 2004, Dr. Aris Slesers undertook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
Ontario the following,
-- that he has ceased to practise medicine and will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction.