skip to content

Slaughter, David Norman

CPSO#: 24445

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Apr 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital,4001 Leslie Street, Toronto, ON M2K 1E1 and Credit Valley Hospital, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:06 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015