skip to content

Slataroff, Youssef Adel

CPSO#: 87329

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437 Ext. 19637
Fax: (905) 336-9632 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 25 Jan 2021 Active
 As from April 21, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yousef Adel Slataroff, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Slataroff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

 UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
  ("Undertaking")
                  
of
                  
DR. YOUSEF ADEL SLATAROFF
("Dr. Slataroff")
                  
to
                  
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
                  
 A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
                  
"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
(2)   I, Dr. Slataroff, certificate of registration number 87329, am a member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(3)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 7213639 (the "Investigation") into my practice at the North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013. 

B.    UNDERTAKING

(4)   I, Dr. Slataroff, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

(5)   Practice Restrictions

(a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake that, effective immediately, I will restrict my practice to adult psychiatry (18 years and older) and, except as expressly set out below; 
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that this restriction does not preclude me from providing emergency psychiatric treatment to children and adolescents (under the age of 18) who present to the Emergency Room ("ER") while I am  on call in the ER, and to provide only emergency treatment when called by the child and adolescent inpatient unit while I am on call in the ER; 
                  
(6)   Monitoring 

(a)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to inform the College of each and every location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
(7)   I, Dr. Slataroff, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)   I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(11)  I, Dr. Slataroff, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College investigation into his practice at the North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013.   In response to the investigation, Dr. Slataroff restricted his practice to adult psychiatry (18 years or older).  Dr. Slataroff may continue to provide emergency psychiatric treatment to patients under the age of 18 while on call in the Emergency Room. 
                  
D.    CONSENT

(12)  I, Dr. Slataroff, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: April 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Youssef Adel Slataroff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 21, 2016:

Dr. Slataroff was the subject of a College investigation into his practice at the North Bay Regional Health Centre in 2011-2013. In response to the investigation, Dr. Slataroff restricted his practice to adult psychiatry (18 years or older). Dr. Slataroff may continue to provide emergency psychiatric treatment to patients under the age of 18 while on call in the Emergency Room.