Slade Shantz, Jesse Alan (CPSO#: 100157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
11910 111th Ave.
Edmonton AB  T5G 0E5
Phone: 780-509-4065
Fax: 780-455-2035
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jesse Slade Shantz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE ALAN SLADE SHANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADE SHANTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013