Slade, Laura Anne (CPSO#: 98671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
300 - 2085 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Phone: (905) 848-7586
Fax: 905-848-7602
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Slade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Slade ( CPSO# 98671 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
300 - 2085 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 848-7586

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE SLADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2018