skip to content

Sky, Kenneth

CPSO#: 21311

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 May 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

1315 Finch Ave W 
Suite 403 
Toronto, Ontario 
M3J 2G6  

4515 Ebenezer
Unit 114
Brampton, Ontario
L6P 0B7

1525 Albion Rd # 100
Etobicoke, Ontario
M9V 5G5
Date Received: 31 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 5, 2009, William Osler Heatlh Centre notified the College that Dr. Kenneth Sky's privileges will be suspended from November 18, 2009 to December 17, 2009.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 2020