skip to content

Skrinskas, Gailutis Joseph

CPSO#: 23595

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-587-6257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Skrinskas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skrinskas ( CPSO# 76164 )
Dr. G. Skrinskas ( CPSO# 23595 )

Business Address:
303 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 587-6257

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAILUTIS JOSEPH SKRINSKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKRINSKAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.