skip to content

Skrastins, Roland

CPSO#: 32352

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
The Chest Centre
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roland Skrastins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jamieson ( CPSO# 53993 )
Dr. R. Skrastins ( CPSO# 32352 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
The Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROLAND SKRASTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKRASTINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1981