skip to content

Skliarenko, Julia

CPSO#: 91014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Phone: 9058131100 Ext. 5923 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Skliarenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Skliarenko ( CPSO# 91014 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIA SKLIARENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKLIARENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2015