skip to content

Sklar, Michael Chaim

CPSO#: 98325

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing Room 4-102
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Sklar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sklar ( CPSO# 98325 )

Business Address:
761 Bay Street - Unit 3507
Toronto ON  M5G R2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHAIM SKLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018