skip to content

Skinner, Christopher Robin Rufus

CPSO#: 31672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5353
Fax: (613) 761-5360 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher R. Skinner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Skinner ( CPSO# 31672 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
C2 Room 2178b
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5353

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 323-3409


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBIN RUFUS SKINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKINNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1980