skip to content

Skillman, Jean Lillian

CPSO#: 24888

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Skillman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Two Rivers Family Health Team, Unit B12, 350 Conestoga Blvd, Cambridge, Ontario N1R 7L7 Tel: 519-629-4615
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Nov 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018