skip to content

Skillings, Jamey Reta

CPSO#: 28258

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005