skip to content

Skeete, Jason Robin

CPSO#: 97450

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kipling Heights Medical Centre
Unit 117
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jason R. Skeete Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Skeete ( CPSO# 97450 )

Business Address:
Kipling Heights Medical Centre
Suite 117
2291 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active
 Dr.  Jason Robin Skeete may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.