skip to content

Sivapalasingam, Nihilarani

CPSO#: 99822

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015