skip to content

Sivapalan, Shivajan

CPSO#: 92139

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Simcoe Street North
Campus Health Clinic
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-3037
Fax: 905-721-3133 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shivajan Sivapalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sivapalan ( CPSO# 92139 )

Business Address:
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-3037

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIVAJAN SIVAPALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAPALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011