skip to content

Sivakumar, Tharsan

CPSO#: 96741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Institute of Diabetes&Endocrinology
Suite 202
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 231-1829
Fax: (905) 231-1849 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Institute of Diabetes
and Endocrinology
Suite 103
3838 Midland Ave
Toronto ON  M1V 5K5
Canada
Phone: (905) 231-1829
Fax: (905) 231-1849
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tharsan Sivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sivakumar ( CPSO# 96741 )

Business Address:
202 - 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1829

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 103
3838 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 5K5
Phone Number: (905) 231-1829


Corporation Name: Sivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sivakumar ( CPSO# 96741 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1829

Business Address:
Suite 103
3838 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 5K5
Phone Number: (905) 231-1829

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THARSAN SIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011