Sivakumar, Shakti (CPSO#: 100492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
& Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34946
Fax: (416) 583-1284
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shakti Sivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sivakumar ( CPSO# 100492)

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAKTI SIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015