skip to content

Sivaharan, Ajantha

CPSO#: 85817

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ajantha Sivaharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sivaharan ( CPSO# 85817 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJANTHA SIVAHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 22 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013