skip to content

Siu, Vincent

CPSO#: 100863

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 6-050a Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 662-1638 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VINCENT SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017