skip to content

Siu, Stephanie Sai-Man

CPSO#: 93116

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Specialized Geriatric Services
North York General Hospital
243 Consumers Road, Unit 300
Toronto ON  M2J 4W8
Phone: 416-756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carefirst Specialist Clinic
Scarborough site
2nd floor
300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Canada
Phone: (416) 847-8940
Fax: 416-646-5109
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Siu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siu ( CPSO# 93116 )

Business Address:
243 Consumers Road
Unit 300
Toronto ON  M2J 4W8
Phone Number: (416) 756-6871

Business Address:
2nd Floor
300 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SAI-MAN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016