skip to content

Sitzer, Nicole Brittany

CPSO#: 97824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6060 - 3080 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 255-8900
Fax: (647) 846-7680 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Olser Health System
Department of Medicine
Division of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6563
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE BRITTANY SITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016