skip to content

Sithamparanathan, Kasthuri

CPSO#: 93340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 579-1212
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-3215
Fax: (416) 264-3446
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KASTHURI SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013