skip to content

Sisson, Daniel James

CPSO#: 103094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N - 950
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4798 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL JAMES SISSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SISSON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SISSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SISSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SISSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SISSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SISSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022