skip to content

Sischek, Stephanie Elisabeth

CPSO#: 96318

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8200
Fax: (519) 272-8243 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.E. Sischek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sischek ( CPSO# 96318 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ELISABETH SISCHEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISCHEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2014