skip to content

Sira, Surjeet Singh

CPSO#: 25354

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jan 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to request copies of their medical records may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 17 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Surjeet Singh Sira to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 2, 2017:

Dr. Sira resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.
Download Full Document (PDF)