skip to content

Siomra, Stephen Walter

CPSO#: 24337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Siomra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 22 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019