skip to content

Sinukoff, Warren Earl

CPSO#: 23989

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Warren E. Sinukoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sinukoff ( CPSO# 23989 )

Business Address:
205 - 738 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 226-3433

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Paitents looking to obtain medical records may call RSRS 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 03 Oct 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019