Singh, Vivek (CPSO#: 96207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC North Hastings Hospital
1­H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Fax: (613) 332-3847
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

QHC Prince Edward County Memorial
Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Lennox & Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Singh ( CPSO# 96207 )

Business Address:
1H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVEK SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017