skip to content

Singh, Stephen Bernard

CPSO#: 90536

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-6880 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stedman Community Hospice
Hankinson House
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-7096 Ext. 2500
Fax: (519) 751-7527
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen Bernard Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 90536 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 751-7096

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN BERNARD SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011