Singh, Sandhya Kavita V (CPSO#: 99364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Sep 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Care
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: (416) 290-5986
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree
4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J1P3
Canada
Phone: 4164798649
Fax: 4167365523
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandhya Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 99364 )

Business Address:
4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
One Care
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sandhya Kavita V. Singh may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.